Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Kristen A. Lucena presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 27, 2013 |
CategoryGuardianship Of Minor - Person Only |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Case Cycle Time2352 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Mailing | |
May 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Terminating Guardianship-Supervision Terminated
Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
February 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing Annual Review Judge: Lucena, Kristen A |
|
February 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Guardianship Review Report and Order
Judge: Lucena, Kristen A |
|
February 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Status Report Confidential Guardianship Status Report |
|
December 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice to Complete and Return Status Report | |
March 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice to Complete and Return Status Report | |
February 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
February 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Guardianship Review Report and Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.