Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Henry, Courtney, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Henry, Waylon, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with William R. Patrick presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 23, 2013 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions390 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time560 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
CRC 5.83 Status Conference Desc: 3RD FL STATUS CONF (CRC 5.83) Notice Date: 2014-11-24 00:00:00.0000000 Disp Code: 936 - OFF-CALENDAR, REQUIREMENTS MET Disp Clerk: JLV Filing Clerk: JLV Judge: Patrick, William R |
|
November 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC: 3RD FL STATUS CONF (CRC 5.83) 11/5/14 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JLV |
|
November 17, 2014 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTERED - MSE = 11/17/14 HON. DAVID E GUNN, COMMISSIONER (B10) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JDW | |
November 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment, Order or Ruling NTC OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JDW |
|
November 14, 2014 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT & CLERKS ENTRY OF DEFAULT - DEFAULT ENTERED 9/17/14 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: ARE | |
November 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
CRC 5.83 Status Conference Desc: 2ND FL STATUS CONF (CRC 5.83) Desc2: FTA: 4/23/14 Notice Date: 2014-04-28 00:00:00.0000000 Disp Code: 906 - CONTINUED TO 5/6/15 Disp Clerk: JLV Filing Clerk: MMH Judge: Patrick, William R |
|
September 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration re Service of Declaration of Disclosure DECL RE SERVICE OF PRELIM DECL OF DISCLOSURE & INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: ARE |
|
September 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
Legacy Docketable Information FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT CHECKLIST Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: ARE |
|
April 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC: (Further) FL STATUS CONF (CRC 5.83) 4/23/14 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMH |
|
April 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
CRC 5.83 Status Conference - Initial Desc: 1st FL STATUS CONFERENCE (CRC 5.83) Disp Code: 906 - CONTINUED TO 11/05/14 Disp Clerk: MMH Filing Clerk: DLB Judge: Patrick, William R |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.