Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hardgrave, Adam, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Hardgrave, Patty M, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Kristen A. Lucena presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 30, 2004 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
Time To Trial2132 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions313 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time3891 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Legacy Docketable Information POS BY MAIL: FOAH OF 05/18/15 AS TO [R] Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DAB |
|
August 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTY FOR [R] Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DAB |
|
August 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Findings and Order After Hearing FINDINGS & ORDER AFTER HEARING HON. KRISTEN A LUCENA; JUDGE (C15) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMC |
|
August 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
Findings and Order After Hearing FINDINGS & ORDER AFTER HEARING ATTY HD Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMC |
|
August 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
OSC hearing Desc: [MINOR'S CNSL] RFO: RELIEF OF COUNSEL Desc2: -FLD 07/20/15 Disp Code: 340 - GRANTED Disp Clerk: ARE Filing Clerk: DAB Judge: Patrick, William R |
|
August 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF: NON-OPPOSITION TO MTN TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL [R] Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DAB |
|
July 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Legacy Docketable Information PRF OF SVC BY MAIL: RFO, ETC; AS TO [P] & CNSL Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DAB |
|
July 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion - Fee [MINOR'S CNSL] RFO: RELIEF OF COUNSEL Fee Type: W3 Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 60.00 Entry Clerk: DAB 493 - $60.00 |
|
June 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
OSC hearing Desc: [R] RFO: C/C, VISITN Desc2: FILED 03/05/15 Desc3: -CONT FROM 03/24/15 FOR THE MEDN REPORT Disp Code: 947 - VACATED/AGREEMENT REACHED ON 05/18/15 Disp Clerk: TMS Filing Clerk: TMS Judge: Patrick, William R |
|
June 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
OSC hearing Desc: [P] RFO: MOD OF C/C, VISITN, TEMPS Desc2: FILED 03/03/15 Desc3: -CONT FROM 04/08/15 FOR THE MEDN REPORT Disp Code: 947 - VACATED/AGREEMENT REACHED ON 05/18/15 Disp Clerk: TMS Filing Clerk: TMS Judge: Patrick, William R |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.