Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with James F. Reilley presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 27, 2004 |
CategoryGuardianship Of Minor - Person Only |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Case Cycle Time1510 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing Desc: ANNUAL REVIEW Disp Code: 399 - G'SHIP ORDERED TO CONT, NO A/R Disp Clerk: SLG Filing Clerk: JCG Judge: Reilley, James F |
|
April 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
Memorandum INVESTIGATOR'S REVIEW REPORT/ORDER HON. JAMES REILLEY; JUDGE (B05) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SLG |
|
April 15, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice CHANGE OF RESIDENCE NOTICE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SLG |
|
April 15, 2008 | Docket Event |
Confidential Supplemental Information CONFIDENTIAL: [ ]SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION [X]GUARDIANSHIP STATUS REPORT (GC251) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SLG |
|
April 18, 2007 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing Desc: ANNUAL REVIEW Disp Code: 169 - G'SHIP REMAINS; A/R 04/16/08 1:30PM Disp Clerk: SAS Filing Clerk: SAS Judge: Glusman, Robert A |
|
April 18, 2007 | Docket Event |
Memorandum INVESTIGATOR'S REVIEW REPORT/ORDER HON. ROBERT A GLUSMAN; JUDGE (B12) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SAS |
|
April 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
Confidential Supplemental Information CONFIDENTIAL: AS TO WINTER MCBRIDE [X]GUARDIANSHIP STATUS REPORT (GC251) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SAT |
|
September 08, 2006 | Docket Event |
Investigative Report RDIANSHIP INVESTIGATION REPORT FEE Fee Type: CK Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Receipt Number: 549552 Fee Amount: 100.00 Entry Clerk: AJA 502 - $100.00 |
|
April 19, 2006 | Docket Event |
Confidential Supplemental Information CONFIDENTIAL: [ ]SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION [X]GUARDIANSHIP STATUS REPORT (GC251) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SAS |
|
April 19, 2006 | Docket Event |
Investigative Report NVESTIGATORS REVIEW REPORT Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SAS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.