Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Steven R. McNelis presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2002 |
CategoryGuardianship Of Minor - Person Only |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Case Cycle Time796 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 23, 2005 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing Desc: ANNUAL REVIEW Disp Code: 342 - CONT G'SHIP-TERM 6/15/05 BY OP OF LAW Disp Clerk: KKA Filing Clerk: DAB Judge: McNelis, Steven R |
|
January 31, 2005 | Docket Event |
Confidential Supplemental Information CONFIDENTIAL: [ ]SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION [X]GUARDIANSHIP STATUS REPORT (GC251) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SAS |
|
January 31, 2005 | Docket Event |
Legacy Docketable Information G'SHIP REVIEW REPORT Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SAS |
|
February 25, 2004 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing Desc: REVIEW HEARING Disp Code: 342 - G/SHIP CONTINUES Disp Clerk: DAB Filing Clerk: DAB Judge: Lamb, William P |
|
February 19, 2004 | Docket Event |
Investigative Report NVESTIGATORS FINDINGS REPORT & RECOMMENDATION PER PROB CODE 1513(a) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: KS |
|
January 27, 2004 | Docket Event |
Confidential Supplemental Information CONFIDENTIAL: [ ]SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION [X]GUARDIANSHIP STATUS REPORT (GC251) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: KKA |
|
January 07, 2004 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC TO GUARDIAN W/GC251 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: KLM |
|
February 13, 2003 | Docket Event |
Appointment Desc: APPT GUARDIAN OF MINOR, PERSON ONLY Disp Code: 340 - GRANTED Disp Clerk: MJO Filing Clerk: MJO Judge: Patrick, William R |
|
February 13, 2003 | Docket Event | ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN OF MINOR (PERSON) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MJO | |
February 13, 2003 | Docket Event |
Letters Issued LETTERS OF GUARDIANSHIP OF MINOR ISSUED (PERSON) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MJO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.