Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with William R. Patrick presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 29, 2001 |
CategoryGuardianship Of Minor - Person Only |
Time To Trial670 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
|
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
|
Case Cycle Time2019 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2007 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS:ORD GRNTG ATTY MOT TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNS TO {P} AND {DCSS} 01/03/07 BY MAIL Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JLV |
|
November 20, 2006 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING ATTY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL - CIVIL HON. WILLIAM R PATRICK; JUDGE (B04) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MJO | |
October 31, 2006 | Docket Event |
Other hearing Desc: FAM LAW RESERVATION Desc2: MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD Desc3: ATT LAWRENCE MURRAY FOR MOTHER & FATHER Disp Code: 399 - FILED AND HEARD Disp Clerk: MJO Filing Clerk: JAS Judge: Patrick, William R |
|
October 31, 2006 | Docket Event |
RFO/OSC Motion Hearing Desc: [COUNSEL FOR MOTHER & FATHER] MTN: TO Desc2: WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD Desc3: (FILED 10/06/06) Disp Code: 340 - GRANTED Disp Clerk: MJO Filing Clerk: MJO Judge: Patrick, William R |
|
May 18, 2006 | Docket Event | REMITTITUR FROM 3RD DCA Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DLG | |
February 09, 2006 | Docket Event |
Legacy Docketable Information DECISION FILED 02-07-06 ROUTED TO ALL JUDGES Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DLG |
|
August 24, 2005 | Docket Event |
Court Trial Desc: FAMILY LAW - LONG CAUSE - OSC/MTN Desc2: CONT ANNUAL REVIEW AND TRAILING Desc3: DFL014585 AND FL019082 Disp Code: 342 - HEARD IN PART/OFF CALENDAR PER COUNSELS Disp Clerk: SAT Filing Clerk: KKA Judge: McNelis, Steven R |
|
July 25, 2005 | Docket Event |
Trial Setting Conference Desc: TRAC --- [1 DAY] Desc2: [CONT ANNUAL REVIEW & TRAILING DFL014585 Desc3: & FL019082] Disp Code: 386 - L/C HEARING SET 08/24/05 2:00 BSM Disp Clerk: KKA Filing Clerk: SAS Judge: Patrick, William R |
|
June 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing Desc: ANNUAL REVIEW Desc2: *CONT'D FROM 6/1/05* Disp Code: 169 - G'SHIP ORDERED TO CONT'U Disp Clerk: SAT Filing Clerk: DAB Judge: McNelis, Steven R |
|
June 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing Desc: ANNUAL REVIEW Disp Code: 399 - ERROR Disp Clerk: SKB Filing Clerk: SAT Judge: McNelis, Steven R |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.