Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Smith, Grace E, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Smith, Donald L, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Sandra L. McLean presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 08, 2021 |
CategoryLegal Separation W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedMay 20, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Proof of Mailing, Order Dismissing Action |
|
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Mailing | |
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Dismissing Action
Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - Predisposition Re: Dismissal Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Mailing | |
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - Court Issued Regarding Dismissal for Failure to Bring to Trial Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
September 04, 1998 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT & CLERKS ENTRY OF DEFAULT Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: NKD | |
September 04, 1998 | Docket Event |
Declaration for Default - Uncontested DECL FOR DEFAULT OR UNCON DISSO - CC4511 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: NKD |
|
August 13, 1998 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons Filed SUMMONS RETURNED & FILED - JD 8/4/98 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SJW |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.