Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Vanderbilt Mortgage And Financ, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Glasser, Evan Samuel, against Bragdon, Lawrence Joseph, Schaffrick, Scott A, Unknown Tenant 1, Unknown Tenant 2, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, FL, . Washington County, FL Superior Courts with Christopher N. Patterson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristopher N. Patterson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 11, 2019 |
CategoryReplevin (15,000) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationWashington County, FL |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER CLOSING CASE | |
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Judge: PATTERSON , CHRISTOPHER N Assigned | |
November 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Updated Event LACK OF PROSECUTION on 1/28/2022 0900 AM Judge CHRISTOPHER PATTERSON results CANCELLED on 11/22/2021 | |
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE IN RESPONSE TO THE COURT'S NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION | |
November 20, 2021 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE AND JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL | |
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE AND JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL | |
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Event LACK OF PROSECUTION scheduled on 1/28/2022 at 0900 AM, CH - Judge CHRISTOPHER PATTERSON presiding. | |
November 09, 2020 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE - LAWRENCE BRAGDON, POSTED 10-19-2020 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.