Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Hancock Whitney Bank, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-D case represented by Mcphail, Kent Dyer, against L And P Logistics Inc, Lawrence, James, represented by Shaffer, William Timothy, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, FL, . Washington County, FL Superior Courts with PATTERSON, CHRISTOPHER NIDA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePATTERSON, CHRISTOPHER NIDA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 26, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWashington County, FL |
|
This complaint is filed by Hancock Whitney Bank against L & P Logistics Inc and James Lawrence in the Circuit Court of Washington County, Florida. The complaint states that the defendants executed a contract on October 17, 2018, promising to pay the ...
COMPLAINT FLSERVICE@KMCPHAIL.LAW
Date: July 26, 2019AFFIDAVIT STATEMENT OF ACCOUNT
Date: December 04, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED JAMES LAWRENCE SERVED
Date: August 20, 2019ANSWER/COUNTER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: October 07, 2019MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGEMENT OF FORECLOSURE
Date: January 08, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: June 24, 2020FINAL JUDGMENT - RECORDED CIVIL ORB 1200 P 202
Date: March 05, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER CLOSING CASE | |
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Judge: PATTERSON , CHRISTOPHER N Assigned | |
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Event LACK OF PROSECUTION scheduled on 1/28/2022 at 0900 AM, CH - Judge CHRISTOPHER PATTERSON presiding. | |
November 20, 2021 | Docket Event | AMNEDED NOTICE AND JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL | |
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE AND JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL | |
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT - RECORDED CIVIL ORB 1200 P 202 | |
December 04, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT STATEMENT OF ACCOUNT | |
December 04, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEYS FEES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.