Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Anthony Filardo filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case against Gina M Filardo, in the jurisdiction of Volusia County. This case was filed in Volusia County Superior Courts Circuit.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 12, 2021 |
CategoryGuardianship |
Last RefreshedSeptember 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationVolusia County, FL |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed By Judge |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Kelly Pitman | |
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event | by Kelly Pitman | |
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | covering 08/16/2021-08/31/2022 | |
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event | covering 08/16/21 - 08/31/22 | |
October 21, 2022 | Docket Event | from Gina Filardo, emailed to Judge | |
October 17, 2022 | Docket Event | of Withdrawal of the Pet. to Resign by Kelly Pitman | |
October 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Atty Kurey to file a Ntc of Withdrawal of Ms. Pitman's Petition to Resign or to submit an Order of Resignation w/appt of replacement Gdn w/in 10 days | |
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Set by Court | |
August 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Status Conf. to be rescheduled | |
August 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Setting Status Conf., esvd. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.