Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ochoa, Nelson E filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Hamson, Brooke Marie, in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Superior Courts with HENDRIKS, JEFFREY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHENDRIKS, JEFFREY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2021 |
CategoryCivil Traffic |
Last RefreshedMay 12, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event | IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES | |
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT MINUTES: DEFENDANT APPEARED IN OPEN COURT, WITH PRIVATE ATTORNEY DOREEN REGENT, ASA WAS PRESENT FOR THE STATE VIA TELECONFERENCE. NO PLEA ENTERED TO CT.1 CARELESS DRIVING (316.1925.1). DEFT''S MOM PRESENT. CONTINUED FOR A COP. DEFENDANT RECEIVED RETURN CARD. CONTINUED FOR: HEARING: NEXT COURT DATE: 5/20/2021 09:00 AM WITH JUDGE HENDRIKS J. | |
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event | DOCKET CALL - B SET FOR 05/10/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN 2E/ , COUNTY JUDGE: HENDRIKS, JEFFREY | |
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT MINUTES: DEFENDANT WAS NOT PRESENT, PRIVATE ATTORNEY DOREEN REGENT APPEARED FOR THE DEFENDANT VIA TELECONFERENCE, OFC N. E. OCHOA WAS NOT PRESENT. NO PLEA ENTERED TO CT.1 CARELESS DRIVING (316.1925.1). DEFENSE MOTION TO CONTINUE GRANTED BY JUDGE. JUDGE WAIVED DEFT''S PRESENCE. CONTINUED FOR: DOCKET CALL - B: NEXT COURT DATE: 5/10/2021 09:00 AM WITH JUDGE HENDRIKS J. | |
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES | |
February 15, 2021 | Docket Event | DOCKET CALL - A SET FOR 03/08/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN 1D/ , COUNTY JUDGE: HENDRIKS, JEFFREY | |
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTE- TR COMPANION WITH 2021CT000221A | |
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event | COUNTY JUDGE HENDRIKS, JEFFREY: ASSIGNED | |
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event | ARRAIGNMENT - CRIMINAL TRAFFIC SET FOR 02/16/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN 1D/ , COUNTY JUDGE: HENDRIKS, JEFFREY | |
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event | ADD SENT TO TCATS - ADJL0CE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.