Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Stone, Robert E Jr, against Adams, Michael Wayne, represented by Mcdavid, Kurt Andrew, Nelson, Jennifer A, in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Superior Courts with ISENHOWER, DARYL presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeISENHOWER, DARYL Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 01, 2021 |
CategoryMisdemeanor |
Last RefreshedAugust 05, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )
Date: February 02, 2021DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )
Date: March 19, 2021NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER
Date: March 12, 2021ORDER FOR PRETRIAL RELEASE ( V )
Date: February 01, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event | TRIAL DOCKET SET FOR 08/17/2021 AT 10:30 AM IN 3C/ , COUNTY JUDGE: ISENHOWER, DARYL | |
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT MINUTES: TRIAL DOCKET: DEFENDANT PRESENT VIA TELECONFERENCE, WITH APD KURT A. MCDAVIDVIA TELECONFERENCE . ASA ROBERT E. STONE JR WAS PRESENT FOR THE STATE VIA TELECONFERENCE. STATE MADE A MOTION TO CONTINUE.MOTION IS GRANTED. VICTIM PRESENT IN OPEN COURT. DEFENDANT IS IN JAIL. CONTINUED FOR: TRIAL DOCKET: NEXT COURT DATE: 8/17/2021 10:30 AM WITH JUDGE ISENHOWER D. | |
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event | IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES | |
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S RECIPROCAL DISCOVERY ( V ) | |
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event | TRIAL DOCKET SET FOR 08/03/2021 AT 10:30 AM IN 3C/ , COUNTY JUDGE: ISENHOWER, DARYL | |
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT MINUTES: DOCKET CALL - B: DEFENDANT WAS NOT PRESENT, (IN JAIL). APD KURT A. MCDAVID AND ASA ROBERT E. STONE JR WERE PRESENT. DEFENSE MOTION TO CONTINUE AND MOTION WAS GRANTED. DEFENSE READY FOR TRAIL. STATE ANNOUNCED FOR TRAIL. , DISPOSITION: CT.1 CONTINUED : . CONTINUED FOR: TRIAL DOCKET: NEXT COURT DATE: 8/3/2021 10:30 AM WITH JUDGE ISENHOWER D. | |
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event | IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENSE ATTORNEY: MCDAVID, KURT ANDREW ASSIGNED | |
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V ) | |
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER TO CONTINUE ( V ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.