Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
U.S. Bank National Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Meisels Jonathan, against Mitchell, Lucille, Mitchell, Hershall H, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 07 CATHERINE L COMBEE presiding.
Case Number |
Judge07 CATHERINE L COMBEE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 22, 2019 |
CategoryRpmfh - Foreclosure Homestead Residential |
Last RefreshedApril 04, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Outcome TypeClosed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT | |
December 30, 2020 | Docket Event | COPY OF REQUESTED CHECK | |
December 17, 2020 | Docket Event | CHECK REQUEST TO DISBURSE FUNDS FROM REGISTRY | |
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event | CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING | |
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
December 02, 2020 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE | |
November 30, 2020 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE SALE BID LOG | |
November 13, 2020 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE | |
November 06, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT/PROOF OF PUBLICATION | |
October 26, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.