Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank National Association As Trustee F, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Authousis Julie, against Overlook Estates Property Owners Association Inc, Nikolaidis Emmanuel J, Nikolaidis Fotene E, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 15 JOHN RADABAUGH presiding.
Case Number |
Judge15 JOHN RADABAUGH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 12, 2019 |
CategoryRpmfh - Foreclosure Homestead Residential |
Last RefreshedApril 03, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 24, 2020 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
December 24, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS DUE TO FOREBEARACE PLAN | |
October 28, 2020 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL AND UPDATED CASE STATUS REPORT | |
August 17, 2020 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL AND UPDATED CASE STATUS REPORT | |
July 16, 2020 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM | |
June 04, 2020 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S STATUS REPORT TO THE COURT | |
May 06, 2020 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING | |
May 06, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STAY/ABATE FORECLOSURE ACTION AND TO EXTEND TIMELINES | |
April 09, 2020 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO STAY ABATE FORECLOSURE ACTION AND TO EXTEND TIMELINES DUE TO COVID-19 | |
March 04, 2020 | Docket Event | DEFAULT - BY CLERK - OVERLOOK ESTATES PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC, FOTENE E NIKOLAIDIS AND |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.