Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lisbon Marcus M, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Henry David G, against Stoneman, Crystal, Stoneman Valorie A, represented by Manno Steven D, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 07 CATHERINE L COMBEE presiding.
Case Number |
Judge07 CATHERINE L COMBEE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 07, 2019 |
CategoryNega - Negligence Auto |
Last RefreshedApril 04, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 04, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
April 03, 2020 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S NTOICE OF ACCEPTING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT | |
March 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;46882;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/067b9530-f35c-4730-9ea4-a93b6d1fde8c/results/da56ef8e-9454-4ba5-8c3d-584bde3d13d0/lines/c8c5bb90-408d-4f26-a405-f710ffd4be3c/Doc REPLY |
|
March 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;46882;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/067b9530-f35c-4730-9ea4-a93b6d1fde8c/results/da56ef8e-9454-4ba5-8c3d-584bde3d13d0/lines/4dffa0ff-b022-446c-9aa4-a96a65d0def0/Doc DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT |
|
March 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;46882;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/067b9530-f35c-4730-9ea4-a93b6d1fde8c/results/da56ef8e-9454-4ba5-8c3d-584bde3d13d0/lines/4dffa0ff-b022-446c-9aa4-a96a65d0def0/Doc CO DEFENDANT CRYSTAL STONEWMANS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT |
|
February 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;46882;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/067b9530-f35c-4730-9ea4-a93b6d1fde8c/results/da56ef8e-9454-4ba5-8c3d-584bde3d13d0/lines/c0007cfa-6659-4b5a-95d6-998d3a107cc6/Doc CERTFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION |
|
January 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;46882;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/067b9530-f35c-4730-9ea4-a93b6d1fde8c/results/da56ef8e-9454-4ba5-8c3d-584bde3d13d0/lines/439ce57e-2bd2-4aee-ac3e-17d6f80075a2/Doc NOTICE OF FILING - SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED - CRYSTAL STONEMAN |
|
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;46882;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/067b9530-f35c-4730-9ea4-a93b6d1fde8c/results/da56ef8e-9454-4ba5-8c3d-584bde3d13d0/lines/9e2ecc26-14b7-4bbd-b1b4-72b52bfc2802/Doc PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO COLLATERAL SET-OFF REQUEST TO PRODUCE |
|
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;46882;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/067b9530-f35c-4730-9ea4-a93b6d1fde8c/results/da56ef8e-9454-4ba5-8c3d-584bde3d13d0/lines/9e2ecc26-14b7-4bbd-b1b4-72b52bfc2802/Doc PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT VALORIE A STONEMAN'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE |
|
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;46882;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/067b9530-f35c-4730-9ea4-a93b6d1fde8c/results/da56ef8e-9454-4ba5-8c3d-584bde3d13d0/lines/1e8c3dca-e38c-4095-a077-e7fa9db66f37/Doc PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.