Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Lopez Consuegra, Alejandro R, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with EPPERSON, HAL C JR presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEPPERSON, HAL C JR Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 15, 2021 |
CategoryTraffic |
Last RefreshedMay 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
CASE DISMISSED BY THE COURT PURSUANT TO PLEA ON 21CT718
Date: July 16, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY
Date: April 06, 2021CITATION FILED AEE2H0E
Date: March 15, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 02, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED BY THE COURT PURSUANT TO PLEA ON 21CT718 | |
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event | TRAPOT WAIVED $2.00 | |
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event | TNM320SC WAIVED $12.50 | |
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event | TNMFN WAIVED $30.00 | |
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event | TNMCC320 WAIVED $68.50 | |
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPANION INFRACTION SET FOR 07/16/2021 AT 1:30 PM IN 5B BEFORE JUDGE: EPPERSON, HAL C JR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.