Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Williams, Gregory Javoris, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with YOUNG, TOM presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeYOUNG, TOM Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 04, 2021 |
CategoryFelony |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
COLLECTIONS & COMPLIANCE FAILED TO RETURN AFTER COURT OR PRISON - 60 DAYS
Date: November 19, 2021CREDIT FOR TIME SERVED WORSHEET
Date: July 01, 2021PLEA AGREEMENT
Date: July 01, 2021SENTENCING GUIDELINES SCORESHEET
Date: July 01, 2021NOTICE OF DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL)
Date: May 25, 2021NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY
Date: May 24, 2021RESET NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT
Date: April 12, 2021ARRAIGNMENT SCHEDULED. NOTICE SENT
Date: March 19, 2021INFORMATION FILED
Date: March 12, 202111/19/2021
Date: April 01, 20247/6/2021
Date: April 02, 20247/1/2021
Date: April 04, 20246/15/2021
Date: April 02, 20245/24/2021
Date: April 05, 20247/1/2021
Date: April 05, 20247/1/2021
Date: April 01, 20244/29/2021
Date: April 02, 20244/12/2021
Date: April 01, 20243/19/2021
Date: April 01, 20246/16/2021
Date: April 01, 20245/25/2021
Date: April 01, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.