Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Brockman, Maria, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case against Publix Super Markets Inc, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with EGAN, ROBERT J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEGAN, ROBERT J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 24, 2021 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
This complaint was filed by Maria Brockman against Publix Super Markets Inc. in the Circuit Court of the Ninth Judicial Circuit of the State of Florida, in and for Osceola County. The plaintiff alleges that on June 13, 2020, while she was a patron at...
COMPLAINT
Date: March 24, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING | |
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING | |
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING | |
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SANCTIONS SET FOR 12/08/2021 AT 2:15 PM IN 5C BEFORE JUDGE: EGAN, ROBERT J |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.