Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Pardo, Clementina, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case against Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with EGAN, ROBERT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 22, 2021 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Clementina Pardo against Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company. The jurisdiction for this case is Osceola County, Florida. The plaintiff alleges breach of contract by the defendant.
According to ...
COMPLAINT
Date: March 22, 20215/11/2021
Date: January 02, 20243/22/2021
Date: January 03, 2024NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: May 11, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
November 18, 2022 | Docket Event | MEDIATORS REPORT | |
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT’S CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORITY FOR MEDIATION | |
October 21, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONFLICT | |
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S WITNESS DISCLOSURE | |
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S EXHIBIT LIST DISCLOSURE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.