Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Orozco, Laura Patricia, filed a(n) case against Cataneda, Martin Orozco, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts with Cheryl A. McCann presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedApril 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing regarding: Default Dissolution Default Dissolution, set for 04/11/2022 at 2:00 PM before Hon. Cheryl A. McCann in Department 5A.
Judge: McCann, Cheryl A. |
|
February 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request to Set Default or Uncontested Matter for Hearing filed by Orozco, Laura Patricia. Request to Set Default or Uncontested Matter for Hearing Judge: Unassigned, |
|
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Default against Martin Orozco Cataneda Entered
Judge: Unassigned, |
|
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request to Enter Default - Family Law filed by Orozco, Laura Patricia. Request to Enter Default - Family Law Judge: Unassigned, |
|
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration filed by Orozco, Laura Patricia. Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration Judge: Unassigned, |
|
December 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons as to Martin Orozco Cataneda filed. Served on 12/23/2021. Method of Service: Personal Service
Judge: Unassigned, |
|
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Summons issued and filed.
Judge: Unassigned, |
|
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Laura Patricia Orozco.
Judge: Unassigned, |
|
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Separate Property Declaration filed by Orozco, Laura Patricia. Separate Property Declaration Judge: Unassigned, |
|
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Income and Expense Declaration filed by Orozco, Laura Patricia. Income and Expense Declaration Judge: Unassigned, |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.