Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Robertson, Ian, Robertson, Jeffrey, Robertson, Rebecca, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Marrese, Michael David, against Emc Insurance Companies, Johnson, Karen Gagnon, represented by Kissane, Joseph Thomas, Oughton, Preston Hall, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 25, 2016 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 11, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
April 11, 2017 | Docket Event | CLOSING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
February 28, 2017 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY RESPONSE | |
February 09, 2017 | Docket Event | REQUEST: REQ FOR COPIES | |
February 06, 2017 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO PRODUCE : THIRD PARTY PRODUCTION | |
February 03, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES | |
February 03, 2017 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY RESPONSE | |
February 03, 2017 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO PRODUCE | |
January 17, 2017 | Docket Event | ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES | |
January 03, 2017 | Docket Event | ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.