Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Manning, Joshua, Marena K. Hinson, Marena K. Ma, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Russo, Megan D., Von Roenn, Nicolle P, against Capitol Preperred Insurance Co, represented by Robrish, Joel David, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, FL, . Nassau County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 28, 2016 |
CategoryContract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNassau County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 13, 2017 | Docket Event | CLOSING ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
October 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
October 03, 2017 | Docket Event | MOTION: FOR FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
June 26, 2017 | Docket Event | RESPONSE: JOSHUA MANNING AND MARENA MANNING | |
June 26, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES | |
June 21, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES | |
June 19, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING: 072017 930AM | |
May 22, 2017 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO PRODUCE | |
May 22, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES | |
May 17, 2017 | Docket Event | MOTION TO SET: FOR JURY TRIAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.