Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
State Of Florida filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Emmanuel Alsina, represented by Ted Hollander, in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, FL, . Monroe County, FL Superior Courts Criminal Plantation Key with Sharon Hamilton presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSharon Hamilton Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 12, 2021 |
CategoryUtc Infraction |
Last RefreshedAugust 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationMonroe County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseCriminal Plantation Key |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event | TRAF SCHL COMPLETED | |
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant Ordered To Attend Traffic School | |
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Traffic Court Disposition Letter | |
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event | HEARING - TR - PRETRIAL - Hamilton, Sharon (Actual: Hamilton, Sharon) | |
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT MINUTES * | |
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Disposition | |
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice Setting Cause for Pretrial | |
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE * Comments: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND PLEA OF NOT GUILTY NOTICE TO PRODUCE AND APPEAR THE DEFENDANT REQUESTS A HEARING BEFORE A COUNTY COURT JUDGE PURSUANT TO TRAFFIC COURT RULE 6.630(N). [E] | |
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION FILED * | |
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION FILED * 5557723 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.