Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Chad R Cohen, filed a(n) case represented by Ryan Martin Bennett, against Florida Peninsula Insurance Company, represented by Doris M Torres, in the jurisdiction of Manatee County, FL, . Manatee County, FL Superior Courts with CHARLES SNIFFEN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCHARLES SNIFFEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 07, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedApril 19, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationManatee County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCVOERY IN LIGHT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY | |
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY JOSE BOSCH ESQ AND DORIS TORRES, ESQ | |
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE DORIS M. TORRES, ESQ. OBO FLORIDA PENINSULA INSURANCE COMPANY. | |
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT | |
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FLORIDA PENINSULA INSURANCE COMPANY, | |
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event | CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO MOTION FOR CLERKS DEFAULT - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS - FLORIDA PENINSULA INSURANCE COMPANY | |
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event | CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT - COPY OF LETTER AND DECLARATION PAGE / | |
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00 AssessmentID 11677512 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.