Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
James C Drake, filed a(n) case represented by Conrado Gomez Jr, against Alexandre Baumeige, Yvan Baumeige, represented by Thomas J Butler, in the jurisdiction of Manatee County, FL, . Manatee County, FL Superior Courts with CHARLES SNIFFEN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCHARLES SNIFFEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 30, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationManatee County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event | RECEIPT OF TRANSFER CASE TO LEE COUNTY | |
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event | ********DO NOT POST CASE TRANSFERRED TO LEE COUNTY - 7012 3050 0002 0574 7199********* | |
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SUMMONS SERVED ALEXANDRE BAUMEIGE, 5/8/2021 | |
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SUMMONS SERVED YVAN BAUMEIGE, 5/8/2021 | |
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event | AGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS | |
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY | |
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE - SEARCH RESULT FROM SUNBIZ.ORG GRAND SLAM YACHT SALES, INC. | |
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE | |
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS THOMAS J. BUTLER, ESQ. OBO ALEXANDRE BAUMEIGE AND YVAN BAUMEIGE, | |
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER CANCELLING HEARING SCHEDULED FOR MAY 5, 2021, AT 3:30 P.M_ |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.