Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
John Giaccone, Sonia Ransom, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Daniel Rosenbaum, against St Johns Insurance Company Inc, represented by Daniel Rosenbaum, in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts with Joseph C Fuller presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph C Fuller Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 12, 2021 |
CategoryCa Insurance Claims |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Voluntary Dismissal
Date: January 18, 2022Final Disposition Form
Date: January 18, 2022Order of Dismissal
Date: December 03, 2021Order to File Disposition Documents
Date: October 25, 2021Notice of Settlement
Date: September 23, 2021Uniform Order Setting Trial/Pretrial/Docket Sounding
Date: September 22, 2021Order/Referral to Nonbinding Arbitration
Date: September 22, 2021Agreed Case Management Plan and Order
Date: September 22, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: August 30, 2021Notice of Service of Proposal for Settlement
Date: July 26, 2021Privilege Log
Date: June 14, 2021Response to Request for Admissions
Date: June 14, 2021Response to Request For Production
Date: June 14, 2021Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: June 14, 2021Reply
Date: May 19, 2021Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Demand for Jury Trial
Date: May 18, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: April 28, 2021Standing Order in Civil Cases
Date: April 13, 2021Request for Production
Date: April 12, 2021Request for Admissions
Date: April 12, 2021Notice of Service of Interrogatories
Date: April 12, 2021Complaint
Date: April 12, 2021Civil Cover Sheet
Date: April 12, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Voluntary Dismissal | |
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Form | |
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Order to File Disposition Documents | |
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement | |
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Uniform Order Setting Trial/Pretrial/Docket Sounding | |
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Order/Referral to Nonbinding Arbitration | |
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Agreed Case Management Plan and Order | |
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Proposal for Settlement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.