Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) Criminal Related (Civil) - Criminal case against Sperlbaum, Jeffrey Alan, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with MENZ, NICOLE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMENZ, NICOLE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 15, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeCriminal Related (Civil) |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - AED3J1E | |
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event | PAID FINE SEQ: 1 | |
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE# 2021 TR 001581 A - SENTENCE IMPOSED: 3/2/2021 EFFECTIVE DATE: 3/2/2021 | |
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $148.00 RECEIPT #2021006970 | |
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION SENT TO TCATS - AED3J1E | |
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT ENTERED PLEA OF GUILTY SEQ 1 | |
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event | SENT LETTER REQ $148 DUE BY 03/17/2021. RETURNED CHECK. | |
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURNED CHECK | |
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 02/16/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 TR 001581 A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.