Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bennett, Reather L, filed a(n) Paternity - Family case against Jones, Norris Betra Jr, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with PEGG, ROBERT L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePEGG, ROBERT L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2006 |
CategoryDor Paternity & Support - Non-Iv-D |
Last RefreshedDecember 07, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypePaternity |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 27, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO CLERK OF EMANCIPATION DATE 9/20/19 | |
March 07, 2017 | Docket Event | RECEIPT OF PAYMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT PURGE | |
February 28, 2017 | Docket Event | RECEIPT OF PAYMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT PURGE | |
February 21, 2017 | Docket Event | WRIT SENT TO IRCSO | |
February 13, 2017 | Docket Event | RECOMMENDATION ON MOTION FOR CONTEMPT/FINAL ORDER ADOPTING RECOMMENDATIONS OF HEARING OFFICER - Recorded (OR.3003.1340. / 3120170010014) | |
February 13, 2017 | Docket Event | WRIT OF BODILY ATTACHMENT $1000 | |
February 13, 2017 | Docket Event | INCOME WITHHOLDING ORDER / FLORIDA ADDENDUM TO IWO | |
February 13, 2017 | Docket Event | REOPENED CASE CLOSED | |
February 09, 2017 | Docket Event | POSTAL VERIFICATION | |
February 08, 2017 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT -ADMITTED DOR #1 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.