Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Insurance Company Of The West, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Youngman, Melissa Ann, against Agundispinestraw Inc, in the jurisdiction of Gilchrist County, FL, . Gilchrist County, FL Superior Courts with BRASINGTON, MONICA J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBRASINGTON, MONICA J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 28, 2016 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedApril 12, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationGilchrist County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
February 13, 2017 | Docket Event | FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
February 09, 2017 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
January 20, 2017 | Docket Event | OUTCOME OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE MEDIATION DISPOSTION REPORT | |
January 17, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFRENCE SET FOR 1/19/2017 @ 10:30 | |
January 06, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF OBJECTION TO CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE AREAS OF INQUIRY | |
January 06, 2017 | Docket Event | OBJECTION TO DUCES TECUM REQUEST | |
December 28, 2016 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO CONDUCT MEDIATION | |
December 27, 2016 | Docket Event | WITNESS LIST FOR PLNTF | |
December 23, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.