Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Florida Credit Union, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Van Leuven, David Tyler, against Cummings, Camie M, Dove Investment Corp, Micciche, Maria, in the jurisdiction of Gilchrist County, FL, . Gilchrist County, FL Superior Courts with Ysleta W. McDonald presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeYsleta W. McDonald Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 06, 2012 |
CategoryRp/Mf-Homestead Resid $50,001-249,999 |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationGilchrist County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 25, 2013 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
March 25, 2013 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT | |
March 11, 2013 | Docket Event | Payment received: $70.00 Receipt Number MX 1783 | |
March 11, 2013 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE FOR $100 TO FLORIDA CREDIT UNION | |
March 11, 2013 | Docket Event | BID INFORMATION SHEET | |
March 11, 2013 | Docket Event | Assessment 3 Total Assessed $70.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
March 11, 2013 | Docket Event | Assessment 3 assessed at sum $70.00 | |
March 07, 2013 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION COSTS | |
March 07, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF PUBLICATION OF NOTICE OF SALE | |
February 12, 2013 | Docket Event | Mortgage filing sale date 3/11/2013 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.