Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Martorano, Shirley, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Tomlinson, Brandon Joel, against Heritage Property And Casualty Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Flagler County. This case was filed in Flagler County Superior Courts with PERKINS, TERENCE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePERKINS, TERENCE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 09, 2021 |
CategoryOther - Insurance Claim |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationFlagler County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT
Date: April 09, 2021DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING FIRST OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF
Date: November 10, 2021DEFENDANT FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF
Date: November 10, 2021DEFENDANTS RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: July 21, 2021DEFENDANTS ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: June 23, 2021DEFENDANTS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: November 10, 2021NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES
Date: April 09, 2021NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS
Date: April 09, 2021COMPLAINT
Date: April 09, 2021DEFENDANTS PRIVILEGE LOG
Date: July 21, 2021AGREED ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ON DISCOVERY
Date: February 11, 2022MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT
Date: May 19, 2021AGREED ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS DISCOVERY
Date: January 25, 2022NOTICE OF FILING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: November 10, 2021NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL OF SETTLEMENT
Date: November 16, 2021MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS DISCOVERY
Date: December 09, 2021PLAINTIFFS ANSWERS TO DEFENDANTS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: March 14, 2022NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS
Date: February 07, 2022COVER SHEET
Date: April 09, 2021SUMMONS PREPARED- HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: April 09, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES
Date: May 17, 2021PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2021005789
Date: April 09, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 14, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS ANSWERS TO DEFENDANTS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS | |
February 11, 2022 | Docket Event | AGREED ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ON DISCOVERY | |
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS | |
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event | AGREED ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS DISCOVERY | |
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS DISCOVERY | |
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL OF SETTLEMENT | |
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING FIRST OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF | |
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF | |
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.