Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Fast Annuity Settlement Transfers Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Schreiber, Darryl S, against Miller, Whitney, M, W, in the jurisdiction of Escambia County. This case was filed in Escambia County Superior Courts Circuit with Shackelford, Jan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeShackelford, Jan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 10, 2021 |
CategoryBusiness Transactions |
Last RefreshedOctober 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationEscambia County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
AGREED FINAL ORDER OF COURT - Recorded (OR.8520.427 / 2021047422)
Date: April 30, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: March 16, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE OF PETITION AND NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: March 17, 2021AGREED FINAL ORDER OF COURT
Date: April 28, 2021APPLICATION FOR COURT APPROVAL OF A TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS
Date: March 10, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event | AGREED FINAL ORDER OF COURT - Recorded (OR.8520.427 / 2021047422) | |
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTICATE OF COMPLIANCE | |
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event | AGREED FINAL ORDER OF COURT | |
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY'S COVER LETTER | |
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event | AMENDED APPLICATION FOR COURT APPROVAL OF A TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS | |
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF PETITION AND NOTICE OF HEARING | |
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event | SHACKELFORD, JAN: ASSIGNED | |
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: SCHREIBER, DARRYL S ASSIGNED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.