Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Doss, Robert, filed a(n) Certiorari case against Escambia County Florida, represented by Shaud, Matthew R, in the jurisdiction of Escambia County. This case was filed in Escambia County Superior Courts with NOBLES, LINDA L. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNOBLES, LINDA L. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 01, 2020 |
CategoryCertiorari |
Last RefreshedMarch 31, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationEscambia County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event | MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE AS UNDELIVERABLE | |
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI AND GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND | |
January 27, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES | |
January 27, 2021 | Docket Event | MRSHAUD@MYESCAMBIA.COM, MEHALEY@MYESCAMBIA | |
December 30, 2020 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2020085639 | |
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE TO PLAINTIFF FROM CLERK | |
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event | FIRST COLLECTIONS NOTICE SENT | |
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 12/11/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 CA 001703 | |
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event | BERGOSH, GARY L: ASSIGNED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.