Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Josue Lara, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Rotstein, Jonathan Isaac, against Jennifer Townsend, Peter R Townsend, represented by Wolf, David Alan, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with AHO, MARIANNE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAHO, MARIANNE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 22, 2020 |
CategoryOther Negligence-Premises Liability-Residential Division: Cv-F |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
This complaint is filed by the Plaintiff, Josue Lara, against the Defendants, Peter R. Townsend and Jennifer Townsend. The incident in question occurred on May 7, 2020, at the premises located at 12185 Emerald Green Court in Jacksonville, Duval Count...
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CLAIM ..
Date: April 13, 2022FINAL DISPOSITION FORM -DISMISSED PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT-BEFORE HEARING
Date: August 03, 2022LETTER TO JUDGE MARIANNE L. AHO FROM DAVID A WOLF, ESQ
Date: April 14, 2022NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE -PLAINTIFF'S
Date: August 03, 2022NOTICE THAT A TRIAL IS SCHEDULED AND A CASE MANAGEMENT IS UNNECESSARY
Date: November 16, 2021NOTICE OF REQUIREMENT FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN
Date: November 05, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: September 21, 2021NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE VIA ZOOM ON 9/7/22 AT 3PM
Date: September 08, 2021MEMORANDUM (TRIAL SET)
Date: September 14, 2021MOTION ( PLAINTIFF'S ) TO SET CASE ON TRIAL DOCKET
Date: April 21, 2021MOTION FOR JURY TRIAL BY PLTF
Date: September 02, 2021NOTICE OF TRIAL AND REQUEST TO DOCKET
Date: April 21, 2021REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (DENIAL)
Date: December 02, 2020REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF)
Date: December 02, 2020ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (DEFTS)
Date: November 23, 2020SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE FOR JENNIFER TOWNSEND ON 11/2/2020 @ 1:15PM
Date: November 17, 2020CASE FEES PAID: $421.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3741933
Date: October 22, 2020SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE JENNIFER TOWNSEND 11/02/2020 1:15 PM
Date: November 10, 2020COMPLAINT
Date: October 22, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event | > CANCEL REASON - DISMISSED | |
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event | CANCELLED JURY TRIAL ON 9/19/2022 9:30:00 AM | |
August 03, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM -DISMISSED PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT-BEFORE HEARING | |
August 03, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE -PLAINTIFF'S | |
April 14, 2022 | Docket Event | LETTER TO JUDGE MARIANNE L. AHO FROM DAVID A WOLF, ESQ | |
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CLAIM .. | |
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE THAT A TRIAL IS SCHEDULED AND A CASE MANAGEMENT IS UNNECESSARY | |
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF REQUIREMENT FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN | |
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES | |
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING CASE FOR JURY TRIAL AND PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING MATTERS TO BE COMPLETED PRIOR TO PRETRIAL CONFERENCE P/T 09/07/2022 @300PM RM704 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.