Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) Criminal Related (Civil) - Criminal case against Slott, James Louis Justin, in the jurisdiction of Clay County, FL, . Clay County, FL Superior Courts with COLLINS, TIMOTHY R. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCOLLINS, TIMOTHY R. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 09, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationClay County, FL |
Matter TypeCriminal Related (Civil) |
CITATION FILED
Date: April 09, 2021DEFENDANT SHOWED PROOF OF VALID REGISTRATION TO CLERK
Date: August 10, 2021PAYMENT $137.00 RECEIPT #101538
Date: August 10, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT SHOWED PROOF OF VALID REGISTRATION TO CLERK | |
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $137.00 RECEIPT #101538 | |
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event | RECALL CASE FROM COLLECTIONS - LINEBARGER | |
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event | D6 CLEARED TRANS ID 67926252 | |
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION SENT TO TCATS - ACWOFSE | |
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - ACWOFSE | |
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event | SENT TO COLLECTIONS - LINEBARGER COLLECTION AGENCY | |
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event | D-6 SUSPENSION SENT TO TCATS | |
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event | D6 ISSUED 07/09/2021 / LICENSE SUSPENDED - PF - $137.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.