Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Foulk, Dominique Rachelle, represented by Varon, Lisa P, in the jurisdiction of Clay County, FL, . Clay County, FL Superior Courts with SHARRIT, MICHAEL S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSHARRIT, MICHAEL S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 11, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationClay County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER
Date: April 11, 2021ORDER OF BOND
Date: April 11, 2021NO ACTION
Date: May 17, 2021ARREST AND BOOKING REPORT
Date: April 11, 2021NOTICE OF APPEAR,WAIVE ARRAIGN,PLEA NG, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY
Date: April 14, 2021DOMESTIC VIOLENCE ORDER SETTING CONDITIONS PRETRIAL RELEASE
Date: April 11, 2021SURETY BOND RELEASE
Date: May 17, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event | NO ACTION | |
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event | SURETY BOND RELEASE | |
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event | UNOPPOSED ORDER TO MODIFY BOND CONDITIONS | |
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION TO MODIFY BOND CONDITIONS | |
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event | AMENDED UNOPOSSED MOTION TO MODIFY BOND CONDITIONS | |
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event | SURETY BOND | |
April 14, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEAR,WAIVE ARRAIGN,PLEA NG, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY | |
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT DECLARED INDIGENT BY CLERK | |
April 11, 2021 | Docket Event | PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.