Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Calhoun, Patricia, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Calhoun, Scott, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Gaard, Janet N presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 28, 2017 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
*Settlement Conference
Date: March 12, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Returned Documents RETURNED DOCUMENTS Notes: RETURNED DOCUMENTS: STIPULATION AND WAIVER OF FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE |
|
March 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Returned Documents RETURNED DOCUMENTS Notes: RETURNED DOCUMENTS: |
|
March 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Decl for Default or Uncontested Dissolution or Legal Sep DECL DEFLT/UNCONT JG Notes: DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT |
|
March 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
705 SETTLEMENT CONFERENC *Settlement Conference MSC & TSC SETTING Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
|
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST* Notes: REQUEST TO SET MSC & TSC FILED BY PETN | |
December 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure DECL RE: SERV OF DEC Notes: FILED BY PET; PRELIM |
|
December 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FILE |
|
December 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Income & Expense Declaration INC & EXP DECL Notes: FILED BY PET |
|
October 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Returned Documents RETURNED DOCUMENTS Notes: RETURNED DOCUMENTS: STIPULATION FOR REFERRAL TO FAMILY LAW MEDIATION COUNSELOR & SEPARATE PROPERTY DCL; DOCUMENTS ARE INCOMPLETE/MISSING PAGE NUMBERS |
|
October 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Income & Expense Declaration INC & EXP DECL Notes: BY RESP |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.