Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Carvalho , Anselmo, Carvalho, Marilene, filed a(n) 3 case represented by Klotzman, Scott E, Perez, Luis Miguel, against Heritage Property & Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Phillips, Brittany, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Bowman, John B. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBowman, John B. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2021 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedOctober 05, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
Copy of Correspondence
Date: February 23, 2021Notice of Filing Interrogs
Date: February 23, 2021Request for Production
Date: February 23, 2021Request for Admissions
Date: February 23, 2021Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: February 23, 2021eSummons Issuance
Date: February 23, 2021Complaint (eFiled)
Date: February 23, 2021Civil Cover Sheet
Date: February 23, 2021Answer to Complaint
Date: April 21, 2021Motion to Compel
Date: April 20, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: April 16, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: March 22, 2021Order Extending Time
Date: March 24, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: March 16, 2021Notice of Service
Date: March 02, 2021Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO
Date: February 24, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: May 03, 2021Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: May 03, 2021Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: May 17, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: May 17, 2021Order Extending Time
Date: May 24, 2021Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: June 03, 2021Motion for Protective Order
Date: June 04, 2021Request to Produce
Date: June 04, 2021Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: June 04, 2021Response to Request for Admissions
Date: June 16, 2021Response to Request for Production
Date: June 16, 2021Privilege Log
Date: June 16, 2021Notice of Service
Date: August 02, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: September 24, 2021Response to Request for Production
Date: August 02, 2021Calendar Call-Order Setting Trial
Date: August 27, 2021Notice
Date: July 12, 2021Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: June 16, 2021Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: July 06, 2021Order Granting Motion
Date: June 23, 2021Notice
Date: September 24, 2021Notice
Date: September 24, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: September 24, 2021Confirmation of Selection for Mediators
Date: September 24, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: October 28, 2021Notice of Settlement
Date: January 25, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Party: Plaintiff Carvalho , Anselmo Plaintiff Carvalho, Marilene |
|
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum | |
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition ANSELMO CARVALHO |
|
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice OF CHANGE OF RECORD ATTORNEY WITHIN FIRM AND DIRECTIONS TO CLERK TO UPDATE ATTORNEY INFORMATION AN EMAIL DESIGNATIONParty: Defendant Heritage Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice IT'S NOTICE OF CHANGE OF RECORD ATTORNEY WITHIN FIRM AND DIRECTIONS TO CLERK TO UPDATE ATTORNEY INFRMATION AND EMAIL DESIGNATIONParty: Defendant Heritage Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant Heritage Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Confirmation of Selection for Mediators | |
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call-Order Setting Trial 10-07-2022 at 10:00 AM |
|
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Service | |
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.