Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Nguyen Hanh, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Porterfield Jessica Laine, Porterfield Nathaniel, in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL, . Brevard County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with KELLY INGRAM presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKELLY INGRAM Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 31, 2021 |
CategoryCounty Eviction |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBrevard County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
CIVIL: MOTION Event Code 2451-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33800082
Date: August 05, 2021ORDER Event Code 6322-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 33773162
Date: July 28, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING Event Code 6724-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33633260
Date: June 28, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING Event Code 6724-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33663511
Date: July 06, 2021RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 33308233
Date: April 14, 2021RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33308224
Date: April 14, 2021MOTION TO DETERMINE AMOUNT DUE Event Code 3138-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33290360
Date: April 09, 2021REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE Event Code 4921-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33285542
Date: April 08, 2021LANDLORD CARES ACT INFO SHEET Event Code 11928-Event Seq 12-Barcode ID 33248541
Date: March 31, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED Event Code 10113-Event Seq 9-Barcode ID 33248262
Date: March 31, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED Event Code 10113-Event Seq 8-Barcode ID 33248261
Date: March 31, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 16, 2021 | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE Event Code 10256-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33850628 | ||
August 16, 2021 | ORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED Event Code 2801-Event Seq 2 | ||
August 10, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OF DEFAULT IN PAYMENT STIPULATION Event Code 5146-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33854936 | ||
August 05, 2021 | CIVIL: MOTION Event Code 2451-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33800082 | ||
July 28, 2021 | ORDER Event Code 6322-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 33773162 | ||
July 28, 2021 | CR: HEARING HEARD Event Code 4407-Event Seq 2 | ||
July 28, 2021 | CAL:EVICTION HEARING Event Code 3954-Event Seq 1 | ||
July 19, 2021 | CAL:EVICTION HEARING Event Code 3954-Event Seq 1 | ||
July 19, 2021 | CR: HEARING CANCELLED Event Code 4291-Event Seq 2 | ||
July 06, 2021 | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING Event Code 6741-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 33663568 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.