Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Nationstar Mortgage Llc Dba Mr, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Fishman, Barry Stuart, against Clerk Of Circuit Court Of Brad, Jones, Debbie J, Lynch, Tammy M, Lynch, Unknown Spouse Of Tammy, Padgett, J Marcus, (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of Bradford County, FL, . Bradford County, FL Superior Courts with WRIGHT, GEORGE MICAH presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWRIGHT, GEORGE MICAH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 07, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 37-D |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBradford County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is a mortgage foreclosure complaint filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper against the defendants in the Circuit Court of the Eighth Judicial Circuit in Bradford County, Florida. The plaintiff alleges that the defendants, Ke...
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: August 07, 2019SUMMONS
Date: August 07, 2019COMPLAINT FOR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE
Date: August 07, 2019Notice of Lis Pendens
Date: August 07, 2019VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM FORM
Date: August 07, 2019Notice of Filing CERTIFICATION OF POSSESSION OR ORIGINAL NOTE
Date: August 07, 2019MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER
Date: August 07, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: J MARCUS PADGETT AKA MARCUS J PADGETT
Date: September 05, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: CLERK OF CIRCUIT COURT OF BRADFORD COUNTY FL
Date: September 05, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #1
Date: August 09, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED TO: UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #1
Date: September 05, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF KEVIN D PADGETT
Date: August 09, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF J MARCHUS PADGETT AKA MARCUS J PADGETT
Date: August 09, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED KEVIN D PADGETT
Date: August 09, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED CLERK OF CIRCUIT COURT OF BRADFORD COUNTY FL
Date: August 09, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF J MARCUS PADGETT NKA LISA PADGETT
Date: September 05, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED TAMMY M LYNCH
Date: August 09, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF TAMMY M LYNCH
Date: August 09, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED DEBBIE J JONES
Date: August 09, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED TO: UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #2
Date: September 05, 2019ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER
Date: August 15, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSOIN #2
Date: August 09, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED TO: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF KEVIN D PADGETT
Date: September 05, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: DEBBIE J JONES
Date: September 05, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: KEVIN D PADGETT
Date: September 05, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: TAMMY M LYNCH
Date: September 05, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: UNKNOWN SPOUSE TAMMY M LYNCH NKA JOHN DOE
Date: September 05, 2019Notice of Filing ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENT ( NOTE -EFILED)
Date: October 15, 2019Notice of Filing AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY SERVICE
Date: September 24, 2019MTN FOR DEFAULT
Date: September 25, 2019NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFENDANT
Date: September 25, 2019NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION W/IN COURT FILE
Date: October 15, 2019Notice of Filing AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTY FEES
Date: October 10, 2019MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND REQUEST FOR ATTORNEYS FEES
Date: November 04, 2019Notice of Filing ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENT (MORTGAGE - EFILING)
Date: October 15, 2019Notice of Filing ORIGINAL NOTE (ORIGINAL)
Date: October 16, 2019AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY'S FEE
Date: November 04, 2019Notice of Filing ORIGINAL MORTGAGE (ORIGINAL)
Date: October 16, 2019ORDER OF REFERRAL TO THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE ORDER SCHEDULING CMC AND HEARING ON PENDING MOTIONS
Date: November 14, 2019HEARING DISPOSITION FORM
Date: January 21, 2020Notice Of Hearing 1-16-20 @ 9:30 AM
Date: December 11, 2019Notice Of Hearing
Date: January 27, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: January 28, 2020Notice of Filing SECOND AFFIDAVIT OF ADDITIONAL ADVANCES
Date: February 10, 2020Notice of Filing AFFIDAVIT OF ADDITIONAL ADVANCES
Date: December 17, 2019Notice of Filing SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY FEES
Date: February 25, 2020MOTION TO CONTINUE AND RESCHEDULE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: April 15, 2020Notice of Filing SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS & SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL
Date: February 27, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: March 11, 2020ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 4-16-20 @9:30 AM
Date: March 12, 2020HEARING DISPOSITION FORM
Date: March 12, 2020Notice Of Hearing 4-16-20 @ 9:30 AM
Date: March 18, 2020NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING 4-16-20
Date: March 31, 2020RETURNED MAIL UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF TAMMY M LYNCH NKA JOHN DOE
Date: March 25, 2020RETURNED MAIL TAMMY M LYNCH
Date: March 25, 2020ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 5-14-20 @ 9:30 AM (4-16-20 CANCELLED)
Date: March 30, 2020RETURNED MAIL TAMMY M LYNCH
Date: April 24, 2020RETURNED MAIL UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF TAMMY M LYNCH NKA JOHN DOE
Date: April 24, 2020ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 2-17-21 @ 9:30 AM
Date: December 17, 2020FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE
Date: October 22, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (CHANGE OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD WITHIN FIRM)
Date: June 14, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY'S FEE (AMENDED)
Date: October 07, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS (AMENDED)
Date: October 07, 2021Notice of Filing AMENDED AFFIDAVIT OF PLF'S COUNSEL & AMENDED AFFIDAVIT OF COST
Date: October 07, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED J MARCUS PADGETT AKA MARCUS J PADGETT
Date: August 09, 2019AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY'S FEE AMENDED
Date: October 15, 2021Notice of Filing AMENDED AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY FEES
Date: October 15, 2021Notice of Filing CERTIFICATION OF BUSINESS RECORDS
Date: October 07, 2021Notice of Sale
Date: October 29, 2021Final Disposition Form
Date: October 20, 2021Notice of Filing ATTORNEYS AFFIDAVIT OF POST JUDGMENT ADVANCES AND POST JUDGMENT INTEREST
Date: January 03, 2022RECEIPT
Date: December 16, 2021RECEIPT FROM FINANCE FOR CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS
Date: January 24, 2022Notice of Sale 12-16-21 (SIGNED)
Date: November 01, 2021RETURNED MAIL TAMMY M LYNCH
Date: November 03, 2021RETURNED MAIL TAMMY M LYNCH
Date: January 26, 2022PROOF OF PUBLICATION SALE DATE 12/16/2021 AT 11A.M.
Date: November 15, 2021CERTIFICATE OF TITLE
Date: December 28, 2021MOTION TO DISMISS MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION
Date: January 03, 2022MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION IN FORECLOSURE CASE
Date: December 29, 2021ORDER SETTING HEARING 1/6/22 @ 1:00 PM
Date: December 29, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT
Date: January 21, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: CHANDLER PADGETT
Date: January 03, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: JESSIE PADGETT
Date: January 03, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT SIGNED
Date: January 24, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL TAMMY M LYNCH | |
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event | DISBURSEMENT OF FUNDS IN THE AMT OF $86,160.43 CK#1829 DATED 1/25/2022 MADE PAYABLE TO NATIONSTAR MTG LLC DBA MR. COOPER | |
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event | RECEIPT FROM FINANCE FOR CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT SIGNED | |
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT | |
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE CANCELING HEARING | |
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to RECLOSE | |
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing ATTORNEYS AFFIDAVIT OF POST JUDGMENT ADVANCES AND POST JUDGMENT INTEREST | |
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE AFFIDAVIT OF POST JUDGMENT ADVANCES AND POST JUDGMENT INTEREST | |
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.