Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Segebart, Jennean Beth, Segebart, Sheldon, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Duboff, Kenneth R, against Asi Preferred Insurance Corp., represented by Campos, Jose, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with OVERSTREET, MICHAEL C presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeOVERSTREET, MICHAEL C Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 27, 2019 |
CategoryInsurance Claim |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
EP - SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: August 27, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 06, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
May 06, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
March 05, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - DEFENDANT'S PRIVILEGE LOG | |
March 05, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - ASI'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
March 05, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - ASI'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS | |
March 05, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE 03/18/2020 @ 2:00 PM CDT | |
March 05, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - ASI'S ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES | |
November 27, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - AGREED ORDER GRANTING DFTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME | |
November 27, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF ENTRY UPON LAND | |
November 27, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - COVER LETTER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.