Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Wood, Janette, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Dever, Steven Mitchell, against Granger, Thelma, Granger, Thomas, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with FISHEL, JOHN L II presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFISHEL, JOHN L II Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 19, 2019 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is filed by Janette Wood against Thomas Granger and Thelma Granger in the Circuit Court of the Fourteenth Judicial Circuit of the State of Florida, in and for Bay County. Janette Wood alleges that on July 2, 2018, Thelma Granger, while...
EP - NOTICE OF FILING & RELIANCE- DFTS RESPONSES TO INTERROG
Date: October 26, 2020EP - CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: September 09, 2020EP - NOTICE OF FILING AND RELIANCE- DEPOSITION EXCERPTS
Date: October 26, 2020EP - SUMMONS ISSUED - THELMA GRANGER
Date: August 19, 2019EP - SUMMONS ISSUED - THOMAS GRANGER
Date: August 22, 2019EP - INITIAL COMPLAINT
Date: August 19, 2019EP - CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: September 24, 2020PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2019046554
Date: August 22, 2019EP - NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY
Date: July 16, 2020EP - CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION
Date: July 16, 2020EP - NOTICE OF FILING & RELIANCE- PHOTOS
Date: October 26, 2020EP - NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING 11/02/20 @ 1:30 PM
Date: November 02, 2020EP - NOTICE OF MEDIATION 02/04/2021 AT 9:30 AM CST
Date: December 22, 2020EP - DEFTS CERTIFICATE OF MEDIATION AUTHORITY
Date: January 25, 2021EP - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Date: March 04, 2021EP - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Date: March 03, 2021EP - COVER LETTER
Date: March 05, 2021EP - ORDER GRANTING DISMISSAL - Recorded (OR.4372.964. / 2021016087)
Date: March 05, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - COVER LETTER | |
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - ORDER GRANTING DISMISSAL - Recorded (OR.4372.964. / 2021016087) | |
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - DEFTS CERTIFICATE OF MEDIATION AUTHORITY | |
December 22, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF MEDIATION 02/04/2021 AT 9:30 AM CST | |
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING 11/02/20 @ 1:30 PM | |
October 27, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - MEMORANDUM OF LAW ON PTFS MTN FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THRESHOLD INJURY, FAULT AND CAUSATION | |
October 26, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF FILING & RELIANCE- DFTS RESPONSES TO INTERROG |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.