Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Coronamelendez, Crystal Jeanette, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Avaloszepeda, Roberto Nieto, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Distaso, Joseph Richard presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDistaso, Joseph Richard Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 30, 2021 |
CategoryDv Prevention With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedJuly 28, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order
Judge: Distaso, Joseph Richard |
|
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Request to Continue (Reissue) DV | |
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Domestic Violence Hearing with Children
Judge: Jacobson, Jack M |
|
July 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Temp Restraining Order | |
July 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
July 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Filing | |
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Confidential Investigative Summary | |
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Confidential Clets | |
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.