Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Devyn Van Duyn, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Reid Van Duyn, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Alan K. Cassidy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAlan K. Cassidy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 25, 2021 |
CategoryDissolution Without Minor Children |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 26, 2024 | Hearing | Case Management Conference | |
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Cassidy, Alan |
|
August 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order
Judge: Cassidy, Alan |
|
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Family Court Services Assessment Worksheet | |
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order
Judge: Jacobson, Jack M |
|
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Responsive Declaration | |
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Income and Expense Declaration (Respondent) | |
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Electronic Service | |
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Mail | |
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.