Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Goiburn, Tiffany, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Goiburn, Tim, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Cassidy, Alan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 17, 2021 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedJuly 14, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Cassidy, Alan |
|
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order
Judge: Cassidy, Alan |
|
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Family Court Services Assessment Worksheet | |
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order
Judge: Distaso, Joseph Richard |
|
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Responsive Declaration | |
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Confidential Declaration | |
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Response | |
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Emergency Orders- Denied | |
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Order- FL-300 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.