Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Naranjo, Miriam Alejandra, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Hernandez, Pastor Pizano, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Maguire, Daniel P. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 21, 2020 |
CategoryDv Prevention Without Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time45 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
575 HRG RE: DV TRO Request for Order - DV/TRO HEARING RE: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE REQUEST Judge: Maguire, Daniel P. |
|
May 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: PASTOR PIZANO HERNANDEZ WITH TRO, NTC OF HRG, REQUEST FOR DVRO, BLANK ANSWER ON 4/24/20 |
|
April 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (in Person) (CLETS) (Domestic Violence) PRF OF SERV DV Notes: PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE DOMESTIC VIOLENCE SERVED PASTOR PIZANO HERNANDEZ ON 04/24/2020 |
|
April 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order APP/DECL OSC/TRO-DV |
|
April 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO JUDGE Notes: DOCUMENT SENT TO JUDGE MAGUIRE FOR REVIEW OF DVRO |
|
April 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE Notes: FAP; JUDGE MAGUIRE |
|
April 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing NTC OF HEARING Notes: NOTICE OF HEARING ON 6/5/20 |
|
April 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order (CLETS-TRO) OSC & TRO (CLETS) Notes: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.