Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Carney, Tatiana Marie, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Walker, Bryan Ray, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts Superior with Cortes, Sonia presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCortes, Sonia Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateFebruary 26, 2020 |
CategoryDv Prevention With Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time21 days |
*Request for Order: Modification
Date: December 30, 2021*Review
Date: May 16, 2023Request for Order - DV/TRO
Date: July 20, 2022*Review
Date: June 06, 2023*Request for Order: Modification
Date: February 06, 2023*Review
Date: April 18, 2023*Request for Order: Modification
Date: February 14, 2023*Request for Order: Modification
Date: December 19, 2022*Review
Date: May 01, 2023*Review
Date: March 20, 2023*Request for Order: Modification
Date: June 07, 2022*Review
Date: April 03, 2023Request for Order - DV/TRO
Date: March 18, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
*Review
Judge: Taylor, Katherine |
|
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
*Review TIMESHARE Judge: Taylor, Katherine |
|
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Restraining Order After Hearing (CLETS OAH) 2ND AMENDED ORDER |
|
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Further Court Trial
Judge: Borack, Jerilyn L. |
|
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Long Cause
Judge: Assigned, Judge |
|
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List BY PET; AMENDED LIST |
|
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To EXHIBITS BINDER TO DEPT 4 |
|
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney FILED BY ATTNY FOR RESP BRYAN WALKER Substitution of Attorney -PRO PER RESP BRYAN WALKER IN PLACE OF JIN KIM |
|
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Returned Documents RETURNED SUB OF ATTNY DUE TO #2 BEING INCOMPLETE |
|
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service ELECTRONICALLY SERVED JIN KIM, ATTY FOR RESP. WITH PETS WITNESS LIST AND PETS EXHIBIT LIST ON 7/27/23. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.