Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Henry, Jeffrey Michael, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Henry, Alera Antoinette, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Maguire, Daniel P. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaguire, Daniel P. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 25, 2020 |
CategoryDv Prevention With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time111 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
FAMILY LAW Request for Order - DV/TRO HEARING RE: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE REQUEST Judge: Maguire, Daniel P. |
|
June 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: ALVERA HENRY WITH TRO AND RELATED DOCUMENTS ON 4/29/20 FILED BY PET |
|
April 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - DV/TRO HEARING RE: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE REQUEST Judge: Maguire, Daniel P. |
|
April 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Continued by Court's Motion CONT BY COURT'S MTN |
|
April 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request to Continue Hearing - DV REISSUE TRO Notes: REISSUE TRO - ORDER ON REQ TO CONT HRG |
|
April 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF CONTINUANCE |
|
March 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
575 HRG RE: DV TRO Request for Order - DV/TRO HEARING RE: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE REQUEST Judge: Maguire, Daniel P. |
|
March 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Continued by Party's Motion CONT BY PARTY'S MTN Notes: PETITIONER - NO POS |
|
February 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order APP/DECL OSC/TRO-DV |
|
February 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order (CLETS-TRO) OSC & TRO (CLETS) Notes: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.