Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Schmauderer, Ivan, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Thompson, Amy L., in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Maguire, Daniel P. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaguire, Daniel P. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 21, 2020 |
CategoryDv Prevention With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time101 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
575 HRG RE: DV TRO Request for Order - DV/TRO HEARING RE: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE REQUEST Judge: Maguire, Daniel P. |
|
April 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - DV/TRO HEARING RE: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE REQUEST Judge: Maguire, Daniel P. |
|
April 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Continued by Court's Motion CONT BY COURT'S MTN |
|
April 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request to Continue Hearing - DV REISSUE TRO Notes: REISSUE TRO - ORDER ON REQ TO CONT HRG |
|
April 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF CONTINUANCE |
|
March 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Continued by Party's Motion CONT BY PARTY'S MTN Notes: RESP |
|
March 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
575 HRG RE: DV TRO Request for Order - DV/TRO HEARING RE: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE REQUEST Judge: Maguire, Daniel P. |
|
February 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (in Person) (CLETS) (Domestic Violence) PRF OF SERV DV Notes: PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE DOMESTIC VIOLENCE; SERVED RESP WITH DV-109, DV-100, BLANK DV-120, DV-110, DV-105, AND DV-140 ON 2/28/2020 |
|
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order (CLETS-TRO) OSC & TRO (CLETS) Notes: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDR |
|
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event | RELATED CASE FILES Notes: UFC - RELATED CASE FILES F319-1383 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.