Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Cordone, David, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Cordone, Ali Marie, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Cortes, Sonia presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCortes, Sonia Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2020 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
*Trial Setting Conference
Date: January 06, 2022*Settlement Conference
Date: January 31, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
*Trial Setting Conference
Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
*Settlement Conference and TSC Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Remote Appearance | |
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Remote Appearance Notice | |
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference Statement FILED BY RESP |
|
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Income & Expense Declaration FILED BY RESP |
|
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service SERVED SARAH ORR, ESQ. ON BEHALF OF DAVID CORDONE WITH RESPONDENT'S INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION DATED 1/20/22 ON 01/20/22 BY ELECTRONIC SERVICE |
|
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service SERVED SARAH ORR, ESQ. ON BEHALF OF DAVID CORDONE WITH RESPONDENT'S SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT ON 1/19/22 BY ELECTRONIC SERVICE |
|
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference Statement PETITIONERS SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT |
|
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service ELECTRONICALLY SERVED MARK GROTEWOHL WITH PETITIONERS SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT AND INCOME AND EXPENSE STATEMENT ON 1/18/2022 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.